WA SB5389 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding membership of the early learning advisory council.
Title
Regarding membership of the early learning advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-27 | Chapter 177, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-27 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-12 | President signed. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-09 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-18 | ELHS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-18 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-10 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-24 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1491 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.