WA SB5389 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a telehealth training and treatment program to assist youth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a telehealth training and treatment program to assist youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback