WA SB5394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning liquor licensees' use of web sites and social media to promote authorized events.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning liquor licensees' use of web sites and social media to promote authorized events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 149, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-22SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-19HouseCOG - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5394&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5394.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5394-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5394-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5394-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117986&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5394&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117986&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5394&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback