WA SB5395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning comprehensive sexual health education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning comprehensive sexual health education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-27SenateChapter 188, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-27SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-02HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-27HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2020-01-22HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-01-13HousePlaced on third reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-12HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-01HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-27SenateFloor amendment
2019-02-27Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenateOn motion, referred to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1407 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5395&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5395.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5395-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5395-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5395-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5395-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117987&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5395&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117987&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=01-22-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5395&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117987&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5395&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117987&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5395&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback