WA SB5397 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the responsible management of plastic packaging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the responsible management of plastic packaging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 460, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-08Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-07SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-07SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-07SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB1204 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5397&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5397.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5397-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5397-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5397-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5397-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5397-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117990&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5397&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117990&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5397&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117990&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5397&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback