WA SB5399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning child relocation by a person with joint decision-making authority and equal residential time.
Title
Concerning child relocation by a person with joint decision-making authority and equal residential time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 79, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |