WA SB5420 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Title
Concerning the distribution of monetary penalties to local courts and state agencies paid for failure to comply with discover pass requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1293 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5420&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5420.pdf |