WA SB5428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning veterans' mental health services at institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning veterans' mental health services at institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Higher Education & Workforce Development.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-05SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-05SenateHEWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

HB1716 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-04 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback