WA SB5429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Including referred and diverted youth in establishing community juvenile accountability program guidelines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Including referred and diverted youth in establishing community juvenile accountability program guidelines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 461, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-20HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:30 AM.
2019-02-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-02-20SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-02-20SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-20SenateFloor amendment
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-23SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-23SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1246 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5429&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5429.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5429.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5429.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5429.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118089&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-20-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5429&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118089&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5429&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118089&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5429&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback