WA SB5438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the H-2A temporary agricultural program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the H-2A temporary agricultural program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 441, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-28HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-06Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-14SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1398 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-22 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5438&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5438.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5438-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5438-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5438-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5438-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5438-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118100&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5438&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118100&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5438&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118100&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5438&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback