WA SB5457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Naming of subcontractors by prime contract bidders on public works contracts.
Title
Naming of subcontractors by prime contract bidders on public works contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 140, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1571 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.