WA SB5470 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning services provided by the office of homeless youth prevention and protection programs.
Title
Concerning services provided by the office of homeless youth prevention and protection programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1657 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5470&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5470.pdf |