WA SB5471 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending the validity of temporary elevator licenses, expanding membership of the elevator safety advisory committee, allowing homeowners to remove certain conveyances from their residences, and eliminating duplicate paperwork.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the validity of temporary elevator licenses, expanding membership of the elevator safety advisory committee, allowing homeowners to remove certain conveyances from their residences, and eliminating duplicate paperwork.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 151, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-22SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-21HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-30SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-29SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1487 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5471&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5471.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5471-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5471-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5471-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118181&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5471&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118181&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5471&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback