WA SB5478 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning minimum renewable fuel content requirements.
Title
Concerning minimum renewable fuel content requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. On motion, referred to Environment. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-18 | EWE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-18 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment and Water & Energy at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-26 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1606 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.