WA SB5488 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sentencing of persons under the age of twenty-one years at the time of the commission of a crime.
Title
Concerning the sentencing of persons under the age of twenty-one years at the time of the commission of a crime.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 141, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-23 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-21 | House | HSRR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | PS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |