WA SB5496 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning modification of precinct and district boundary lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning modification of precinct and district boundary lines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-13HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-21SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback