WA SB5497 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a statewide policy supporting Washington state's economy and immigrants' role in the workplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a statewide policy supporting Washington state's economy and immigrants' role in the workplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 5/21/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 440, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-24SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 38; absent, 3; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-07Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1815 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5497&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5497.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5497-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5497-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5497-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5497-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5497-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118253&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5497&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118253&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5497&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118253&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5497&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback