WA SB5499 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of state to print and distribute a voters' pamphlet for the primary in each even-numbered year and for the general election every year.
Title
Requiring the secretary of state to print and distribute a voters' pamphlet for the primary in each even-numbered year and for the general election every year.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1482 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5499&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5499.pdf |