WA SB5504 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state agency employee access to peer-reviewed journals.
Title
Concerning state agency employee access to peer-reviewed journals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1363 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.