WA SB5511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding affordable, resilient broadband service to enable economic development, public safety, health care, and education in Washington's communities.
Title
Expanding affordable, resilient broadband service to enable economic development, public safety, health care, and education in Washington's communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019*. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 365, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-05 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-03-28 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1498 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.