WA SB5512 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning basic skills assessments for approved teacher preparation programs.
Title
Concerning basic skills assessments for approved teacher preparation programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1621 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5512&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5512.pdf |