WA SB5522 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing code cities with the ability to annex unincorporated areas pursuant to a jointly approved interlocal agreement with the county.
Title
Providing code cities with the ability to annex unincorporated areas pursuant to a jointly approved interlocal agreement with the county.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Chapter 142, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |