WA SB5549 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the performance of personal services by members of the liquor industry to retailers.
Title
Addressing the performance of personal services by members of the liquor industry to retailers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1762 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5549&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5549.pdf |