WA SB5549 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modernizing resident distillery marketing and sales restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modernizing resident distillery marketing and sales restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-04-10SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 3; absent, 2; excused, 2.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-10Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-21SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1411 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-21 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback