WA SB5550 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Implementing the recommendations of the pesticide application safety work group.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the recommendations of the pesticide application safety work group.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 327, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-01HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-21HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-05SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-05SenateLBRC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1725 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5550&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5550.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5550-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5550-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5550-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118370&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5550&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118370&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5550&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118370&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5550&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback