WA SB5558 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating dissemination of juvenile records by consumer reporting agencies.
Title
Regulating dissemination of juvenile records by consumer reporting agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-21 | On motion, referred to Rules. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-18 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-31 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |