WA SB5558 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Reinstating the authority of the department of social and health services and the health care authority to purchase interpreter services for applicants and recipients of public assistance who are sensory-impaired.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reinstating the authority of the department of social and health services and the health care authority to purchase interpreter services for applicants and recipients of public assistance who are sensory-impaired.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 4/26/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 152, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-22SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2019-02-26SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-26SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback