WA SB5566 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning setting fees for administration of the prevailing wage program.
Title
Concerning setting fees for administration of the prevailing wage program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 193, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-01 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1361 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.