WA SB5572 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing modernization grants for small school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing modernization grants for small school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget.
2019-03-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4.
2019-03-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-18Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM.
2019-02-08SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback