WA SB5573 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning domestic violence and traumatic brain injury. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning traumatic brain injuries in domestic violence cases. )

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning domestic violence and traumatic brain injury. (REVISED FOR ENGROSSED: Concerning traumatic brain injuries in domestic violence cases. )

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateGovernor vetoed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-26HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenateFloor amendment
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateHSRR - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5573&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5573.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5573.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5573.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118427&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5573&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118427&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5573&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118427&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5573&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback