WA SB5578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing threats to southern resident killer whales by improving the safety of oil transportation.
Title
Reducing threats to southern resident killer whales by improving the safety of oil transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1578 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.