WA SB5584 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning joint self-insurance programs for property and liability risks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning joint self-insurance programs for property and liability risks.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-11HouseCPB - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-11HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-07SenateFIET - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

HB1431 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback