WA SB5585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning cooperation between conservation districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning cooperation between conservation districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2019-02-25SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-25SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2019-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-07SenateLGOV - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

HB1426 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback