WA SB5588 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the production, distribution, and sale of renewable hydrogen.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the production, distribution, and sale of renewable hydrogen.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-17SenateChapter 24, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-17SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-10SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-29HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-21HouseENVI - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-02-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-15Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-08SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-07SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5588&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5588.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5588-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5588-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5588-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118472&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5588&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118472&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5588&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback