WA SB5597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a work group on aerial pesticide applications in forestlands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a work group on aerial pesticide applications in forestlands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-09SenateChapter 355, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-03HouseRDAN - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-21SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5597&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5597.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5597-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5597-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5597-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118481&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5597&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118481&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5597&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118481&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5597&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback