WA SB5602 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminating barriers to reproductive health care for all.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminating barriers to reproductive health care for all.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 59 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019*.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 399, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-25HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-25HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-25HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-25HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-25HouseRules suspended.
2019-04-25HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2019-04-19SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1612 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-25 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5602&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5602.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5602-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5602-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5602-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5602-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118486&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5602&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118486&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5602&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118486&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5602&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118486&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5602&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback