WA SB5605 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning misdemeanor marijuana offense convictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning misdemeanor marijuana offense convictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 67 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 69 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 400, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 15; absent, 3; excused, 1.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-23HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-23HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-23HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-23HouseRules suspended.
2019-04-23HouseHouse receded from amendments.
2019-04-19SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01HousePS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety.
2019-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-14SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-14SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-14SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-12SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1500 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5605&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5605.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5605.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5605.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118489&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5605&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118489&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5605&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118489&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5605&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118489&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5605&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback