WA SB5623 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Strengthening the rights of workers through collective bargaining by addressing authorizations and revocations, certifications, and the authority to deduct and accept union dues and fees.
Title
Strengthening the rights of workers through collective bargaining by addressing authorizations and revocations, certifications, and the authority to deduct and accept union dues and fees.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] |
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1575 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.