WA SB5627 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the healthy energy workers board.
Title
Establishing the healthy energy workers board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 53, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-21 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |