WA SB5633 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting and expanding behavioral health workforce pathway programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting and expanding behavioral health workforce pathway programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateBH - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 6:00 PM.
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback