WA SB5635 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding opportunities for students to pursue mental and behavioral health professions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding opportunities for students to pursue mental and behavioral health professions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseCWD - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-03-09SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-09SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-19SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-19SenateHEWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development.

Same As/Similar To

HB1850 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback