WA SB5640 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning youth courts.
Title
Concerning youth courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 191, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-23 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-04-25 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2019-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. |
2019-04-25 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-26 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |