WA SB5649 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting the statute of limitations for sexual assault.
Title
Adjusting the statute of limitations for sexual assault.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 87, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |