WA SB5651 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a kinship care legal aid coordinator.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a kinship care legal aid coordinator.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 6/30/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 465, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-22SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-27SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-27SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-27SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateLAW - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-25SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5651&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5651.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5651.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5651.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118608&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5651&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118608&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5651&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118608&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5651&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback