WA SB5672 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning adult family home specialty services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning adult family home specialty services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 466, 2019 Laws PV.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor partially vetoed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 31; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-17HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-17HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-17HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-17HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-27HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-22SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-13SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5672&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5672.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5672-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5672-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5672-S2.PL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118679&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5672&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118679&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-17-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5672&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118679&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5672&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback