WA SB5675 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning drought preparedness and response.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning drought preparedness and response.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB1622 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback