WA SB5679 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the mitigation of public facilities in certain cities.
Title
Concerning the mitigation of public facilities in certain cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1724 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.