WA SB5687 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing new government employees the option of opting out of retirement system membership if the employee is age sixty or older when first hired, or when the employee's employer opts into retirement plan participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing new government employees the option of opting out of retirement system membership if the employee is age sixty or older when first hired, or when the employee's employer opts into retirement plan participation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-14SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-12SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-12SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-12SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback