WA SB5689 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning harassment, intimidation, bullying, and discrimination in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning harassment, intimidation, bullying, and discrimination in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-29SenateChapter 194, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-29SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-23SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-18SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-09HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-09HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-09HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-02-27SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-27SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-27Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-22SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-22SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-22SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5689&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5689.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5689-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5689-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5689-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118724&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5689&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118724&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-09-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5689&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=118724&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-18-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5689&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback