WA SB5692 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning recreational fishing and hunting licenses.
Title
Concerning recreational fishing and hunting licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1708 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.